MO HB2125 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to emergency medical services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to emergency medical services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-02-20HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-18HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-23HouseReferred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
2020-01-14HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-13HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback