MO HB2129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires thirty minutes of instruction regarding decisions on organ donation during high school
Title
Requires thirty minutes of instruction regarding decisions on organ donation during high school
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 2129 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 2129 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: HB 2129 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 145 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: HB 2129 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 2129 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: HB 2129 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 145 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: HB 2129 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-07-05 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-18 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-05-18 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 135 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-18 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 3, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 1, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-18 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-10 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-10 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-04-10 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |