MO HB213 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-14 - Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31(H)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-14 - Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31(H)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that no abortion of a viable, unborn child can be performed or induced except in certain specified situations
Title
Specifies that no abortion of a viable, unborn child can be performed or induced except in certain specified situations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31(H) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-12 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-12 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-05-12 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Third Read and Passed (S) | |
2011-05-12 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2011-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-17 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-03-14 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Laid Over (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-16 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2011-01-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |