MO HB214 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding human trafficking
Title
Changes the laws regarding human trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-10 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-04-28 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-04-28 | Third Read and Passed (S) | |
2011-04-28 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2011-04-27 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-17 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2011-03-07 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-03 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-03-02 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-16 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2011-01-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |