MO HB217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the duration of unemployment compensation, modifies the method to pay federal advances, and raises the fund trigger causing contribution rate reductions.
Title
Modifies the duration of unemployment compensation, modifies the method to pay federal advances, and raises the fund trigger causing contribution rate reductions.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB217&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0611H.01I.pdf |