MO HB2281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all sales or transfers of firearms be processed through a licensed firearms dealer
Title
Requires that all sales or transfers of firearms be processed through a licensed firearms dealer
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Razer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2281&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5521H.01I.pdf |