MO HB2285 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each member of the General Assembly to be provided a key which accesses the State Capitol dome and authorizes the Governor to convey certain state property
Title
Requires each member of the General Assembly to be provided a key which accesses the State Capitol dome and authorizes the Governor to convey certain state property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-09 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-14 | Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 90 NOES: 63 | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 137 NOES: 14 | |
2010-05-14 | House Concurs (H) - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 145 NOES: 8 | |
2010-05-12 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1 | |
2010-05-12 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-12 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-12 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-05-12 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-05-03 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions (H) | |
2010-03-04 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |