MO HB2322 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Second read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Second read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of the retirement system for prosecuting and circuit attorneys
Title
Modifies provisions of the retirement system for prosecuting and circuit attorneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 2322 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions(S) |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 90 NOES: 45 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-13 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2018-03-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |