MO HB2456 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to reimbursement allowance taxes.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to reimbursement allowance taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: HB 2456 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: HB 2456 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 27 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Senate Fiscal Oversight-Wednesday, April 8, 2020, 9:30 am, Room 117, pending referral |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Senate Appropriations-Tuesday, April 7, 2020, 12:00 pm, Room 117, pending referral |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2020-03-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-18 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |