MO HB248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation law.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |