MO HB253 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Failed to Pass over Veto (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Failed to Pass over Veto (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the streamlined sales and use tax agreement, tax amnesty, the community development district tax, income tax, sales and use taxes, use tax nexus, and the transportation development tax
Title
Changes the laws regarding the streamlined sales and use tax agreement, tax amnesty, the community development district tax, income tax, sales and use taxes, use tax nexus, and the transportation development tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | House | Failed to Pass over Veto (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 67 |
2013-09-11 | House | Failed to Pass over Veto (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 67 |
2013-06-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-06-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-06-05 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2013-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-09 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 126 NOES: 28 |
2013-05-09 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 103 NOES: 51 |
2013-05-09 | House | House Concurs (H) - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 103 NOES: 51 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS AS AMENDED |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 9 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 4, SA 5 ADOPTED AYES: 24 NOES: 9 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 8, 2013, 1:30PM, SCR 1 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) - SA 4, SA 5 ADOPTED |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SS/SA 3 PENDING |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 2, 2013, 8:30AM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 106 NOES: 48 |
2013-04-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-15 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2013-04-15 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 ADOPTED |
2013-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred: International Trade(H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |