MO HB2562 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes treatment courts
Title
Establishes treatment courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House: HB 2562 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 138 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: HB 2562 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: HB 2562 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: HB 2562 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: HB 2562 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-13 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-07-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 138 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-05-16 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SSA 1 for SA 6, SA 7 adopted AYES: 23 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Mondsy, April 23, 2018, 2:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-09 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-04 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-04-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-04-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |