MO HB262 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Division of Workers' Compensation.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Division of Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB262&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0857H.01I.pdf |