MO HB266 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the designation of "MIssouri Historical Theater" and specifies criteria to apply for and achieve such designation.
Title
Creates the designation of "MIssouri Historical Theater" and specifies criteria to apply for and achieve such designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 266 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 266 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 266 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 266 (HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 266 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 266 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 266 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 266 (HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2019-07-11 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2019-05-17 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 135 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 11, 2019, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-02-21 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |