MO HB274 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Special Committee on Student Accountability(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Student Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Special Committee on Student Accountability(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Student Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions related to the display of posters containing representations of the Missouri state flag and other items in public schools.
Title
Creates new provisions related to the display of posters containing representations of the Missouri state flag and other items in public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Student Accountability(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB274&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0797H.01I.pdf |