MO HB278 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any state or local governmental entity; public building, park, or school; or public setting or place from banning or restricting the practice, mention, celebration, or discussion of any federal holiday
Title
Prohibits any state or local governmental entity; public building, park, or school; or public setting or place from banning or restricting the practice, mention, celebration, or discussion of any federal holiday
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | House Message (H) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | House Votes to Override Veto (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 45 |
2013-09-11 | Senate | House Votes to Override Veto (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 45 |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 28 NOES: 2 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted Do Pass |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 16, 2013, 1:30PM,SCR1 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 32 |
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |