MO HB292 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding powers of banks
Title
Changes the laws regarding powers of banks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 292 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 292 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 132 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: HB 292 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 292 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 132 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: HB 292 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-07-11 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 132 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 2 |
2017-05-11 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 136 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, March 28, 2017, 9:45am, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 8:08am, Senate Lounge |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Insurance and Banking(S) |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-28 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 Adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-02-28 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-01-31 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |