MO HB3 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding presidential elections
Title
Changes the laws regarding presidential elections
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-17 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-10-17 | SS Defeated (S) - YEAS: 16 NAYS: 16 | |
2011-10-17 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-10-17 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-09-14 | Laid Over (S) | |
2011-09-14 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-09-13 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-09-13 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-09-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-09-12 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2011-09-09 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-09-09 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 | |
2011-09-09 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-09-09 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-09-08 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-08 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-09-07 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2011-09-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-09-06 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |