MO HB305 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Laid Over (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Laid Over (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the 2011 State Employee Retirement Incentive Program
Title
Establishes the 2011 State Employee Retirement Incentive Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Laid Over (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-12 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Retirement (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |