MO HB306 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that if federal funds are not appropriated for the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP), the General Assembly shall fund the program.
Title
Specifies that if federal funds are not appropriated for the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP), the General Assembly shall fund the program.
Sponsors
Rep. Cora Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB306&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0871H.01I.pdf |