MO HB310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Special Committee on Career Readiness(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Career Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Special Committee on Career Readiness(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Career Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires teacher-training institutions in this state receiving state funds to require students to demonstrate proficiency on the concepts of trauma-informed approach and trauma-specific interventions.
Title
Requires teacher-training institutions in this state receiving state funds to require students to demonstrate proficiency on the concepts of trauma-informed approach and trauma-specific interventions.
Sponsors
Rep. Cora Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Career Readiness(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB310&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0796H.01I.pdf |