MO HB329 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding financial institutions
Title
Changes the laws regarding financial institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-09-11 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2013-09-11 | House | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | House | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2013-09-11 | House | House Votes to Override Veto (H) |
2013-09-11 | House | House Votes to Override Veto (H) |
2013-07-02 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-02 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-06 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 17 |
2013-05-06 | House | House Concurs (H) - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 141 NOES: 17 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 34 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - AYES: 34 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS Voted Do Pass |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 8, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 2 |
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Rules - No Action Taken (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |