MO HB400 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-12 - Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31(H)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-12 - Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31(H)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for the administration of RU-486 or any other abortion-inducing drug or chemical
Title
Establishes requirements for the administration of RU-486 or any other abortion-inducing drug or chemical
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | House | Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31(H) |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 115 NOES: 39 |
2013-05-13 | House | House Concurs (H) - SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 119 NOES: 39 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 2 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 23 NOES: 7 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - SA 1 WITHDRAWN, SA 2 ADOPTED |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 PENDING |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 29, 2013, 1:00 P.M., SCR 1 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 39 |
2013-04-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 41 |
2013-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Health Care Policy(H) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |