MO HB451 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a change in population shall not remove a city, county, or political subdivision from the operation of a law
Title
Specifies that a change in population shall not remove a city, county, or political subdivision from the operation of a law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: HB 451 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: HB 451 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: HB 451 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: HB 451 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 28, 2017, 9:00am, Senate Lounge |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Local Government and Elections(S) |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-02 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 83 NOES: 74 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-03-02 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-27 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-02-27 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-08 | House | Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |