MO HB499 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to transportation.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 499 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 90 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 499 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 499 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 499 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: HB 499 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 499 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 499 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 499 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: HB 499 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2019-07-09 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2019-05-29 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2019-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2019-05-17 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-05-16 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2019-05-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2019-05-16 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES GRIESHEIMER, RUTH, KNIGHT, WINDHAM, CHAPPELLE-NADAL |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SCHATZ, LIBLA, EIGEL, CURLS, WILLIAMS |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2019-05-15 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-15 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2019-05-15 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 13, 2019, 1 p.m., Bingham Conference Room |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 10, 2019, 8:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 offered |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 11, 2019, 8:20am, Senate Lounge |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | HCS#2 Adopted (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-12 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-06 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Re-committed to Committee: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Motion to Recommit Adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |