MO HB591 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Missouri Dental Board to issue a limited teaching license to a dentist employed as an instructor in an accredited dental school located in this state
Title
Authorizes the Missouri Dental Board to issue a limited teaching license to a dentist employed as an instructor in an accredited dental school located in this state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-08 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-10 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-05-09 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-05-09 | Third Read and Passed (S) | |
2011-05-09 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-05 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-04 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-12 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |