MO HB616 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the offense of false impersonation by including a person who falsely represents himself or herself to a law enforcement officer upon being lawfully detained.
Title
Modifies the offense of false impersonation by including a person who falsely represents himself or herself to a law enforcement officer upon being lawfully detained.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB616&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1348H.01I.pdf |