MO HB633 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions for water, wastewater, and sewer.
Title
Establishes provisions for water, wastewater, and sewer.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bondon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |