MO HB65 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies a definition relating to alcohol.
Title
Modifies a definition relating to alcohol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: HB 65 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-09 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-09 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |