MO HB67 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to municipal courts.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to municipal courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House: HB 67 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 8, 2019, 12:00pm, Bingham Conference Room Amended time change |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-05 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-05 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-01-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |