MO HB729 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for a violent offender registry, which will include any person on probation or parole for first or second degree murder.
Title
Establishes procedures for a violent offender registry, which will include any person on probation or parole for first or second degree murder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |