MO HB744 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the duration of certain orders of protection
Title
Modifies the duration of certain orders of protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House: HB 744 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 19, 2 p.m., SCR 1 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2021-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |