MO HB75 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred: Financial Institutions(H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred: Financial Institutions(H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a parent or guardian of a minor to request a security freeze on the minor's credit report.
Title
Authorizes a parent or guardian of a minor to request a security freeze on the minor's credit report.
Sponsors
Rep. Nate Tate [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB75&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0406H.01I.pdf |