MO HB760 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits publishing of the names of lottery winners
Title
Prohibits publishing of the names of lottery winners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2013-03-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB760&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0760I.htm |