MO HB77 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to teacher and school employee retirement systems.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to teacher and school employee retirement systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: HB 77 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: HB 77 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: HB 77 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: HB 77 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass Consent (S) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 27, 2019, 10:30 a.m. or upon morning recess, SCR 1 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Health and Pensions (S) |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-18 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-13 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-13 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |