MO HB850 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding military complaints against a commanding officer in the National Guard
Title
Changes the law regarding military complaints against a commanding officer in the National Guard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: HB 850 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 114 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: HB 850 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 114 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-09 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-09 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-06 | House | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 30, 2017, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2017-03-28 | House | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans’ and Military Affairs(S) |
2017-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-03-27 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-15 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |