MO HB904 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Ensuring Access to High Quality Care for the Treatment of Substance Use Disorders Act."
Title
Establishes the "Ensuring Access to High Quality Care for the Treatment of Substance Use Disorders Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |