MO HB93 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding job training
Title
Changes the laws regarding job training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 93 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 93 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: HB 93 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 93 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: HB 93 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-07-05 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-11 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 144 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 6, 2017, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 12:00 p.m. or Upon Noon Recess, Senate Lounge |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Economic Development(S) |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-28 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-02-28 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |