MO HCB3 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to funds for vulnerable senior citizens
Title
Modifies provisions relating to funds for vulnerable senior citizens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: HCB 3 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 83 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: HCB 3 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 32 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-05-12 - House - House: HCB 3 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 85 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: HCB 3 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 107 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HCB 3 HCBs for THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HCB 3 HCBs for THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HCB 3 (*HA 1) HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HCB 3 (*HA 3) HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 49 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HCB 3 HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 89 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HCB 3 HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: HCB 3 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 32 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-05-12 - House - House: HCB 3 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 85 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: HCB 3 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 107 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HCB 3 HCBs for THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HCB 3 HCBs for THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HCB 3 (*HA 1) HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HCB 3 (*HA 3) HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 49 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HCB 3 HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 89 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HCB 3 HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-12 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-12 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 32 NOES: 115 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 83 NOES: 67 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-12 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 85 NOES: 63 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-12 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-09 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-09 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Requests House to Take Up and Pass (S) |
2017-05-09 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-09 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SS AYES: 107 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-05-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 27 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 27 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (S) - Vote by which HCB 3 passed, motion by which the title agreed to , motion by which emergency clause was adopted, motion to reconsider third reading as amended AYES: 30 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 to SA 3, SA 2 to SA 3, SA 3 to SA 3, SA 3 as amended AYES: 28 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 5, 2017, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, SCR 1 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 85 NOES: 72 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-03-16 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-15 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 89 NOES: 65 PRESENT: 3 |
2017-03-15 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-15 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
2017-03-08 | House | Reported for Introduction (H) - AYES: 24 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Voted to Introduce (H) |
2017-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Authorized - Delivered to the Committee on Budget |