MO HCR38 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports the relocation of the ABC Heart of America Education Trust's trade and technical school from Mission, Kansas to Kansas City, Missouri

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supports the relocation of the ABC Heart of America Education Trust's trade and technical school from Mission, Kansas to Kansas City, Missouri

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-20 Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2011-04-20 Rules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2011-04-20 Rules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2011-04-12 Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
2011-04-12 Reported Do Pass (H)
2011-03-29 Voted Do Pass (H)
2011-03-29 Executive Session Completed (H)
2011-03-08 Public Hearing Completed (H)
2011-02-24 Referred: Economic Development (H)
2011-02-23 Offered (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback