MO HCR38 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the U.S. Congress to decrease the Environmental Protection Agency's authority to regulate water quality and the use of coal and wood as energy sources

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges the U.S. Congress to decrease the Environmental Protection Agency's authority to regulate water quality and the use of coal and wood as energy sources

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-13SenateSenate Message (S)
2014-05-13SenateAdopted (S) - AYES: 20 NOES: 9
2014-05-13SenateTaken Up
2014-05-08SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2014-05-06SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
2014-05-06SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-05-01SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 6, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge
2014-04-28SenateReferred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
2014-04-23HouseReported to The Senate (S)
2014-04-23HouseAdopted (H)
2014-04-23HouseTaken Up
2014-04-10HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-04-09HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-04-09HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-31HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-03-31HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-03-27HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-03-04HouseReferred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H)
2014-02-25HouseOffered (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback