MO HCR71 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates January 21 as Jaycees Day in Missouri.
Title
Designates January 21 as Jaycees Day in Missouri.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HCR71&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3204H.01I.pdf |