MO HR3 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Adopted (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Adopted (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants use of the House Chamber for presentation of Glory Awards on Monday, April 14, 2014, from 8:30 a.m. to 11:30 a.m.
Title
Grants use of the House Chamber for presentation of Glory Awards on Monday, April 14, 2014, from 8:30 a.m. to 11:30 a.m.
Sponsors
Rep. John Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | House | Adopted (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Approved (H) |
2014-09-10 | House | Offered (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HR3&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HR0003I.htm |