MO HR4532 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Approved (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Approved (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants use of the House Chamber and Rotunda for swearing in of attorneys on Friday, April 24, 2020, and Friday, September 25, 2020, from 10:00 a.m. to 3:00 p.m
Title
Grants use of the House Chamber and Rotunda for swearing in of attorneys on Friday, April 24, 2020, and Friday, September 25, 2020, from 10:00 a.m. to 3:00 p.m
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Approved (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HR4532&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4346H.01I.pdf |