MO SB110 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures to follow in child custody and visitation cases for military personnel
Title
Establishes procedures to follow in child custody and visitation cases for military personnel
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] | Rep. Charlie Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Senate | Legislature voted to override Governor's veto |
2013-09-11 | Senate | H adopted motion to override Governor's veto (Davis) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | S adopted motion to override Governor's veto (Brown) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-15 | House | S Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2013-05-15 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2013-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-14 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Austin)--(0521H06.01H) |
2013-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-15 | House | H Second Read |
2013-02-14 | House | H First Read |
2013-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 110-Brown |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled |