MO SB12 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to charges for the service of court orders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to charges for the service of court orders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 12 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 12 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-13HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-10HouseExecutive Session Cancelled H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-04-30HouseHearing Conducted H Judiciary
2019-04-16HouseHearing Cancelled H Judiciary
2019-03-27HouseReferred H Judiciary
2019-03-18HouseH Second Read
2019-03-14HouseH First Read
2019-03-14SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-03-12SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-12SenatePerfected
2019-03-12SenateSCS S adopted
2019-03-11SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-02-21SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS
2019-02-11SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 12 & 123) Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0414S.02C)
2019-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 12-Cunningham
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback