MO SB123 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 12 & 123)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 12 & 123)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain appointed persons who serve court orders to collect the charge for such service for deposit into the Deputy Sheriff Salary Supplementation Fund
Title
Allows certain appointed persons who serve court orders to collect the charge for such service for deposit into the Deputy Sheriff Salary Supplementation Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 12 & 123) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 123-White |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=44 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB123.pdf |