MO SB144 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 144-Burlison, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 144-Burlison, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds call spoofing to the prohibited solicitations under the no-call list
Title
Adds call spoofing to the prohibited solicitations under the no-call list
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 144-Burlison, with SCS |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS |
2019-04-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (0717S.03C) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 144-Burlison |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |