MO SB163 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-14 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-14 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the composition of the Coordinating Board for Higher Education, Board of Curators of the University of Missouri and the governing board of Missouri State University
Title
Modifies the composition of the Coordinating Board for Higher Education, Board of Curators of the University of Missouri and the governing board of Missouri State University
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-14 | No motion made to override Governor's veto | |
2011-07-07 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-05 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-05 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-05 | S concurs in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-04 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-04 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Schupp)--(1045L03.01H) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Thomas)--(1045L03.01L) | |
2011-04-20 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Higher Education Committee | |
2011-04-12 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Higher Education Committee | |
2011-04-05 | Hearing Conducted H Higher Education Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Higher Education Committee | |
2011-03-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-17 | H First Read | |
2011-03-17 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Perfected | |
2011-03-09 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2011-03-09 | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Green)--(1045S02.01S) | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-02 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (1045S.02C) | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2011-01-25 | S First Read--SB 163-Pearce |