MO SB167 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to bonding requirements on public works

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to bonding requirements on public works

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 167 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateSigned by Governor
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-09SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-09HouseS Third Read and Passed
2019-05-09HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2019-05-06HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-06HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-06HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Ellington)--(0888H05.17H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Griesheimer)--(0888H05.12H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 2 to HCS, as amended, H withdrawn
2019-05-06HouseHA 5 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Runions)--(0888H05.28H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 4 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(0888H05.26H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 3 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Beck)--(0888H05.25H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Shaul-113)--(0888H05.21H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Falkner III)--(0888H05.22H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered (Stacy)--(0888H05.05H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stacy)--(0888H05.15H)
2019-04-30HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-04-25HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-18HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-18HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy
2019-04-17HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy
2019-04-03HouseHearing Conducted H Insurance Policy
2019-03-27HouseReferred H Insurance Policy
2019-03-11HouseH Second Read
2019-03-07HouseH First Read
2019-03-07SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-03-05SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-05SenatePerfected
2019-03-05SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2019-03-05SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Crawford)--(0888S04.01S)
2019-02-21SenateReported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS
2019-02-20SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (0888S.04C)
2019-02-06SenateHearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
2019-01-31SenateSecond Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 167-Crawford
2018-12-10SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback